HI SB689 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB689
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Agriculture and Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Mandates the Department of Agriculture to take precautionary measures to anticipate, prevent, or minimize the adverse effects of biotechnology and genetic engineering.
Title
Relating To Genetic Engineering.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB689 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to AEN/CPH, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=689&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB689_.HTM |