HI SB698 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB698
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an owner or occupier of agricultural land to notify the Land Use Commission of the agricultural uses for which land was subdivided. Grants the Commission enforcement authority over conditions, restrictions, uses, and subdivision of agricultural lands, including the right to enter and inspect lands, issue orders, and impose fines or liens for violations. (SB698 HD1)
Title
Relating To Agricultural Lands.
Sponsors
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] |
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] | Sen. Donna Kim [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1360) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2017-03-17 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Kong, Cullen, Evans, Say, Fukumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, C. Lee, Lowen. |
2017-03-14 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 03-17-17 10:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2017-03-09 | House | Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 27 |
2017-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 237) in amended form (SD 2). |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) English). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-17. |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 800) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2017-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Galuteria, Harimoto, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Inouye ; 0 No(es): none; and 4 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz, English, K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2017-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-24-17 1:45PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-23-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Reported from WTL/AEN/PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 528) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Wakai, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Baker. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, Nishihara, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Kim. |
2017-02-10 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/AEN/PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-17 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to WTL/AEN/PSM, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB97 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB698 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).
SB698 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Representative(s) LoPresti voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6).