HI SB704 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - (S) Act 009, 4/25/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-25 - (S) Act 009, 4/25/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Exempts certain third party owners and operators of on-site renewable energy systems from regulation as public utilities by the public utilities commission. (SD2)
Title
Renewable Energy; Public Utilities Commission
Sponsors
Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Josh Green [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | (S) Act 009, 4/25/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109). | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Act 009, on 4/25/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1109). | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-06 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 378). | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1424), recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Herkes, Yamane, Brower, Ito, Keith-Agaran, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Ching. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 03-28-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, McKelvey, Saiki, Wooley excused (4). | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Reported from EEP (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1001), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. | |
2011-03-15 | (H) The committees on EEP recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Coffman, Chang, Herkes, Nakashima, Riviere, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, Chong, Har, Ito. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-15-11 9:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to EEP, CPC, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 158) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 521) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Taniguchi, Green, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Solomon, Slom. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) The committee(s) on CPN will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 11:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to CPN. | |
2011-02-14 | (S) Reported from ENE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 119) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to CPN. | |
2011-02-01 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, English, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 02-01-11 3:30PM in conference room 225. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to ENE, CPN. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |