HI SB717 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-29 - The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-29 - The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DLNR to establish an environmental mitigation program and to enact rules to allow landowners within the State to establish conservation and mitigation banks for purposes of conserving habitat for fish, wildlife, and plants.
Title
Conservation and Mitigation Bank; Development; Environmental Mitigation
Sponsors
Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in WTL were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on ENE recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in ENE were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Ruderman, Chun Oakland, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/ENE has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-13 2:15PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Referred to WTL/ENE, WAM. |
2013-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=717&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/SB717_.HTM |