HI SB770 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of an eligible business activity under the State enterprise zones law and increases the number of areas in each county that may be designated as an enterprise zone.
Title
Construction Task Force (2010); Tax Credit; Enterprise Zones; Eligible Business Activity
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be HELD. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-02-11 1:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=770 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2012/Bills/SB770_.HTM |