HI SB772 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB772
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to establish and conduct the Marine Life Conservation District Carrying Capacity Program. Requires the Department of Land and Natural Resources to submit reports to the Legislature. Appropriates funds. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Marine Life Conservation Districts.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Sen. Tim Richards [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2023-02-16 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 382) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Elefante, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-13-23 12:30PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB772 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Administrative Rules
Appropriation ($)
Carrying Capacity
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Marine Life Conservation Districts
Program
Report
Appropriation ($)
Carrying Capacity
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Marine Life Conservation Districts
Program
Report