HI SB777 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB777
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-06-22 - Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the list of acceptable institutions or organizations that can approve the continuing education courses needed by naturopathic physicians for license renewal. (SB777 HD2)
Title
Relating To Health Care Professionals.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-28 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-22 | House | Received notice of all Senate conferees being discharged (Sen. Com. No. 535). |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Conferee(s) discharged. |
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Baker Chair; J.Keohokalole, Fevella. |
2019-04-05 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685). |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2019-04-04 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Quinlan excused (2). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-02 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Thursday, 04-04-19. |
2019-04-02 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1936) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa. |
2019-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-22 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 40 |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on IAC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1309) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to IAC. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, B. Kobayashi, Belatti, Nakamura, San Buenaventura, Say, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tokioka. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HLT on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 329. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HLT, IAC, CPC, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 244) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 755) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2019-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara, Ruderman, Fevella. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB777 (Carry Over) 2019-04-18 - Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 920).