HI SB781 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB781
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows a defendant convicted of certain prostitution offenses to file a motion to vacate the conviction if the defendant is not subsequently convicted of any offense under the penal code within twelve months after the date of the original conviction and is not facing current criminal charges. Repeals certain requirements pertaining to filing a motion to vacate, including the burden of proof, and exclusions of certain convictions of certain prostitution offenses.
Title
Relating To Prostitution.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB781 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to JDC.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=781&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB781_.HTM |