HI SB786 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 5:15PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-01 - Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 5:15PM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the administration and operation of the Aha Moku Advisory Committee and for community outreach. (SB786 HD1)
Title
Aha Moku Advisory Committee; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 5:15PM in conference room 423. |
2015-05-01 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 4:15pm in conference room 423. |
2015-04-30 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 05-01-15 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-28 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-30-15 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-15 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-15 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 624). |
2015-04-20 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 642). |
2015-04-20 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Ing, Yamane, Lowen Co-Chairs; DeCoite, Pouha. |
2015-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Shimabukuro Chair; L. Thielen, Kouchi Co-Chairs; Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-04-16 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 638). |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 542). |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2015-04-10 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1580), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2015-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ward. |
2015-04-02 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Tuesday, 04-07-15 2:30PM in House conference room 308. |
2015-03-27 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Choy, Ing, Lowen, Luke, McKelvey, Pouha excused (6). |
2015-03-27 | House | Reported from OMH/WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1109) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Cullen, Ing, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen. |
2015-03-23 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ing, Cullen, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Say, Yamane, Pouha, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Lowen, Evans. |
2015-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by OMH/WAL on Monday, 03-23-15 11:00AM in House conference room 325. |
2015-03-12 | House | Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2015-03-12 | House | Pass First Reading |
2015-03-10 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 203) in amended form (SD 2). |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-10-15. |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 831) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2015-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 8 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Kouchi, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, Slom. |
2015-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-15 1:00PM in conference room 211. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2015-02-18 | Senate | Reported from HWN/WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 230) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Ihara, Riviere, Ruderman, Shimabukuro; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Slom. |
2015-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Kahele; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN deferred the measure until 02-11-15 1:25PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL deferred the measure until 02-11-15 2:45PM in conference room 224. |
2015-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-15 2:50PM in conference room 224. |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to HWN/WTL, WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1380 (Same As) 2015-02-02 - Referred to OMH/WAL, FIN, referral sheet 6