HI SB804 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB804
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes HPHA and HHFDC to provide rental housing projects for teachers employed by the DOE and public charter schools. Appropriates funds for HPHA. Appropriates funds for deposit into the dwelling unit revolving fund. Requires the DOE to lease land and contract with private entities for teacher housing. Permits the private entities to lease teacher housing to other eligible tenants under certain circumstances. Effective 12/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Teacher Rental Housing.
Sponsors
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] | Sen. Jarrett Keohokalole [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-23 - House - House Housing: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-16 - Senate - Senate Housing: Passed, Unamended (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1380) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakamura, Hashimoto, Aquino, DeCoite, Ilagan, Kitagawa, Takumi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-23-21 10:30AM in House conference room 423 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on HSG with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1031) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to HSG. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Okimoto; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to EDN, HSG, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 280) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 868) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 03-02-21 10:05AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-26-21 9:30AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported from HOU/EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 518) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-16 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HOU were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chang, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Moriwaki, Rhoads. |
2021-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU/EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-16-21 1:30PM in conference room 225. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to HOU/EDU, WAM. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB804 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).