HI SB806 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB806
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds to the UH college of tropical agriculture and human resources cooperative extension service for one full-time ornamental plant extension agent.
Title
Relating To The University Of Hawaii College Of Tropical Agriculture And Human Resources Cooperative Extension Service.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Kalani English [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] |
Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HRE/AEN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 181) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HRE were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Kahele, Kidani, Espero, Keith-Agaran, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Riviere, K. Rhoads, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Nishihara. |
2017-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HRE/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 1:00PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Referred to HRE/AEN, WAM. |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB482 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB806 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
SB806 (Carry Over) 2017-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=806&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB806_.HTM |