HI SB812 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Act 029, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1130).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Act 029, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1130).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes the operating budget for certain programs of the Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs. Establishes or amends certain special fund ceilings and provides for suspension or refund of fees if the ceiling is exceeded. (SB812 HD2)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-29 | Senate | Act 029, 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1130). |
2019-04-29 | House | Act 029, on 04/26/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1130). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-04-11 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 895). |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Passed Final Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Senator(s) S. Chang. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Senate agrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-11-19. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 717). |
2019-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Say voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-09-19. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2214) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:30PM in conference room 308. |
2019-03-27 | House | The committee(s) on FIN recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-03-19. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1693) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Gates, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 9:00AM in House conference room 430. |
2019-03-14 | House | Re-referred to IAC, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 257) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1031) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-28-19 10:30AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-08 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 107) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-01-29 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, Ruderman; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen, Fevella. |
2019-01-25 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 01-29-19 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |