HI SB823 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-05 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires insurers to clearly give consumers notice of the choice of whether to use an aftermarket part, if available, or an original equipment manufacturer part for motor vehicle body repair work. (SB823 HD2)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Motor Vehicle Repairs.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-04SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 548).
2019-04-03HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan excused (1). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-03HouseReported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1965), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-27HouseThe committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Holt.
2019-03-25HouseBill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-27-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308.
2019-03-22HouseReport adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2).
2019-03-22HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1662) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN.
2019-03-21HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cachola, Har, Kong, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Mizuno.
2019-03-20HouseBill scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 03-21-19 2:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-03-19HouseThe committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until Thursday, 03-21-19.
2019-03-15HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-15HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McKelvey, Nakamura, Quinlan, Takumi excused (4).
2019-03-15HouseReported from IAC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1368) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on IAC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, D. Kobayashi, Kong, Nishimoto, Takayama, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Gates.
2019-03-11HouseBill scheduled to be heard by IAC on Thursday, 03-14-19 8:30AM in House conference room 430.
2019-03-11HouseRe-referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 29
2019-03-07HouseReferred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 27
2019-03-07HousePass First Reading
2019-03-05HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 266) in amended form (SD 1).
2019-03-05SenatePassed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28Senate48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19.
2019-02-28SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1).
2019-02-28SenateReported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 784) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading.
2019-02-26SenateThe committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 6 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, S. Chang, J.Keohokalole, Nishihara, L. Thielen, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Ruderman.
2019-02-22SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-26-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on CPH deferred the measure until 02-22-19 9:30AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 229.
2019-02-05SenateRe-Referred to CPH.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to TRS, CPH.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback