HI SB826 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB826
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits a sex offender from residing within two thousand feet of the sex offender's former victim or the victim's immediate family members. Requires the sex offender to receive approval from the Attorney General prior to a change in address. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Sex Offenders.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-10 | Carried over to 2022 Regular Session. | |
2021-03-30 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2021-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-30-21 2:00PM in House conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to JHA, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 289) in amended form (SD 1). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ihara. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 758) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2021-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-21 9:31AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2021-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-22 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB563 (Same As) 2021-12-10 - Carried over to 2022 Regular Session.
SB826 (Carry Over) 2021-03-30 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
SB826 (Carry Over) 2021-03-30 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.