HI SB831 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:30AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-28 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:30AM in conference room 423.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes a new markets tax credit for qualified equity investment on a credit allowance date and that is exempt from the requirements of section 704(b)(2) of the Internal Revenue Code; restricts community development entity investments to low-income communities in Hawaii; includes franchise taxes and insurance premium taxes eligible for the tax credit. Exempts federally tax exempt companies that supply potable water from the state income and general excise taxes. (SB831 HD2)
Title
New Markets Tax Credit; Section 704(b)(2), Internal Revenue Code
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:30AM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-26-11 1:30PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-21 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-25-11 1:45PM in conference room 423. | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 660). | |
2011-04-19 | (H) Re-referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 63 | |
2011-04-19 | (H) House conferees appointed: McKelvey, M. Oshiro Co-Chairs; Choy, Evans, Ward. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Fukunaga, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Baker, English, Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 476). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1; placed on the calendar for Third Reading with none voting no (0) and Takumi excused (1). | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1452) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Coffman. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Bill scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-11 5:00PM in conference room 308. | |
2011-04-04 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 04-05-11. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Monday, 04-04-11 3:30PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Re-referred to FIN, referral sheet 37 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to ERB, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 199) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 539) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Ige, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Kidani. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-16 | (S) Reported from EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 242) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-11 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDT were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Wakai, Baker, Solomon, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-11-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-07 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT deferred the measure until 02-09-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to EDT, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |