HI SB837 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB837
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism to acquire and hold title to or contract to acquire by grant or purchase real, personal, or mixed property; to clear, improve, and rehabilitate and to sell, assign, exchange, transfer, convey, lease, dispose, or encumber the property; and acquire property by condemnation. Effective 6/30/3000. (HD1)
Title
Relating To The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-03-17 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 03-21-23 2:00PM in House conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-16 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JHA with Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Kapela voting no (1) and Representative(s) Perruso excused (1). |
2023-03-16 | House | Reported from WAL/ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1243) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JHA. |
2023-03-14 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, La Chica, Nakamura, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Pierick; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2023-03-14 | House | The committee on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Poepoe, Chun, Hashem, Morikawa, Takayama, Souza; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ganaden; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2023-03-10 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/ECD on Tuesday, 03-14-23 11:15AM in House conference room 430 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to WAL/ECD, JHA, FIN, referral sheet 17 |
2023-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2023-03-07 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 286) in amended form (SD 1). |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Report Adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Awa). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-07-23. |
2023-03-03 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1076) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2023-02-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Gabbard, Elefante, San Buenaventura; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Awa; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-24-23 9:30AM; Conference Room 016 & Videoconference. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2023-02-14 | Senate | Reported from EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 214) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2023-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-23 1:01PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to EET, JDC. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB837 (Carry Over) 2023-03-21 - The committee(s) on JHA recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Condemnation
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Property Acquisition and Disposition
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Property Acquisition and Disposition