HI SB873 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB873
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM.
Pending: Senate Public Safety, Intergovernmental and Military Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires notice be given to certain county agencies at least 30 days prior to construction or installation of certain agricultural buildings and structures that are exempt from building permit and code requirements. Imposes a fine of $100 per day of violation if construction or installation begins within 30 days of notice.
Title
Relating To Agricultural Buildings.
Sponsors
Sen. Les Ihara [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM/AEN, JDC/WAM. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee on AEN deferred the measure. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | The committee on PSM deferred the measure. |
2017-01-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM/AEN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-17 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM/AEN, JDL/WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB873 (Carry Over) 2017-02-08 - The committee on AEN deferred the measure.
Subjects
Agricultural Buildings and Structures
Building Code Requirements
Building Permit Requirements
Exemption
Notice
Building Code Requirements
Building Permit Requirements
Exemption
Notice
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=873&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SB873_.HTM |