HI SB876 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires all public elementary, intermediate, and middle schools in the county of Hawaii to participate in the safe routes to school program. Appropriates funds to support the safe routes to school program for schools in the county of Hawaii. (SD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To The Safe Routes To School Program.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-13SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM.
2019-02-13SenateReported from EDU/TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 297) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Harimoto ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) English.
2019-02-08SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz.
2019-02-05SenateThe committee(s) on EDU/TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-19 1:30PM in conference room 225 .
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EDU/TRS, WAM.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback