HI SB896 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB896
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-12-01 - Carried over to 2020 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates a state lottery division within the department of budget and finance with rulemaking authority to implement a state lottery limited to the Powerball and Mega Millions lottery games. Allocates lottery profits to education, homeless programs, and the general fund. Creates lottery and lottery prizes revolving funds. Appropriates funds.
Title
Relating To Generation Of State Revenues.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-01 | Carried over to 2020 Regular Session. | |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to GVO/HMS/EDU, JDC/WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB896 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to GVO/HMS/EDU, JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=896&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/SB896_.HTM |