HI SB9 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires and sets a deadline for the department of public safety to pursue and obtain accreditation for the sheriff division from the Commission on Accreditation for law Enforcement Agencies, Inc. Report to legislature in 2012 regular session on progress and problems. (SD1)
Title
Department of Public Safety; Sheriff Division; Accreditation
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Mike Gabbard [D] | Sen. Les Ihara [D] |
Sen. Malama Solomon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-18 | (S) Reported from PGM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 347) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PGM were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Kidani, Baker, Ryan, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-10 | (S) The committee(s) on PGM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-15-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-31 | (S) Re-Referred to PGM, WAM. | |
2011-01-20 | (S) Referred to PGM. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-19 | (S) Introduced. |