HI SB9 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 215, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on July 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-09 - Act 215, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the Hawaii public housing authority to adopt rules without regard to chapter 91, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to reimburse Section 8 landlords for repair costs of tenant-caused property damage under certain circumstances. Appropriates funds. (CD1)
Title
Relating To The Hawaii Public Housing Authority.
Sponsors
Sen. Stanley Chang [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] |
Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Kurt Fevella [R] | Sen. Sharon Moriwaki [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-09 | Senate | Act 215, 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317). |
2019-07-09 | House | Act 215, on 07/02/2019 (Gov. Msg. No. 1317). |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883). |
2019-05-01 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968). |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2019-04-30 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2019-04-26 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 97) as amended in (CD 1). |
2019-04-26 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19. |
2019-04-26 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 97). |
2019-04-25 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Moriwaki; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-04-25 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Hashem; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) McDermott. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-19 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-24-19 1:00PM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 918). |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: S. Chang Chair; Moriwaki Co-Chair; Fevella. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 809). |
2019-04-15 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Brower, Matayoshi Co-Chairs; Hashem, McDermott. |
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 639). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-04 | House | Deferred one day 04-05-19. |
2019-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2099), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-03-28 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Nishimoto, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Todd. |
2019-03-25 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with Representative(s) Okimoto voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Quinlan, Yamane excused (3). |
2019-03-19 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1413) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Matayoshi, Cullen, Hashem, Hashimoto, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Woodson. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:30AM in House conference room 423. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to HSG, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 31) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1139) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2019-02-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, Riviere. |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-20-19 10:05AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Reported from HOU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 313) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HOU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) S. Chang, Kanuha, Moriwaki, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Fevella. |
2019-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HOU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Referred to HOU, WAM. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced. |
Subjects
Appropriation ($)
Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Property Damage
Section 8 Housing Choice Voucher Program
Hawaii Public Housing Authority
Property Damage
Section 8 Housing Choice Voucher Program