HI SB900 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 4:30PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-29 - (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 4:30PM in conference room 229.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates an unspecified amount of funds to use surplus or available open or vacant space to establish a safe haven for persons who are homeless. Effective July 1, 2030. (SB900 HD2)
Title
Homelessness; Safe Havens; Appropriation
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 4:30PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-28 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-29-11 11:30AM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-27 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-28-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-25 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-27-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-26 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 675). | |
2011-04-25 | (H) House conferee(s) added: Representative(s) Kawakami as Co-Chairs. | |
2011-04-25 | (H) House Conferee(s) discharged: Representative(s) Cabanilla Co-Chairs. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-25-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 643). | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-19-11 4:00PM in conference room 229. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Cabanilla, Mizuno, Chong Co-Chairs; Ching. | |
2011-04-18 | (S) Senate Conferees appointed: Chun Oakland, Chair; Ige, Co-Chair(s); Fukunaga, Ihara, Slom. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 480). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 2 with Representative(s) Aquino, Belatti, Cullen, Hanohano, Johanson, Jordan, Marumoto, Souki, Wooley, Yamane voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Fontaine, Har, Pine voting no (3) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1574) as amended in HD 2, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-30 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Cullen, Hashem, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Coffman, Har, Jordan; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 03-30-11 11:00AM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused (3). | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from HSG/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1191) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, C. Lee, Wooley, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Jordan, Belatti, Hanohano, Morikawa, Pine; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ching. | |
2011-03-23 | (H) The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Chong, Coffman, Har, Herkes; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Pine; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Chang, Ito, Nakashima, Thielen. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Proposed draft of Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HUS on Wednesday, 03-23-11 11:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred until 03-23-11. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HSG/HUS on Wednesday, 03-16-11 10:00AM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HSG/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 206) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-03 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 531) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Tokuda, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi, Ryan. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 225) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-03 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. | |
2011-01-27 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-03-11 1:15PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HMS, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |