HI SB921 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - (H) Act 179, on 7/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on July 5 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-07-05 - (H) Act 179, on 7/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain child service providers to provide emergency shelter and related services to minors at no cost under certain circumstances. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB921 HD3)
Title
Minors; Emergency Shelter; Consent
Sponsors
Sen. Suzanne Chun Oakland [D] | Sen. Donovan Cruz [D] | Sen. Carol Fukunaga [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] |
Sen. David Ige [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Pohai Ryan [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-05 | (H) Act 179, on 7/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283). | |
2011-07-05 | (S) Act 179, 7/1/2011 (Gov. Msg. No. 1283). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Enrolled to Governor. | |
2011-04-20 | (H) Received notice of reconsideration, Senate agreement, and Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-20 | (S) Passed Final Reading. 24 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 1 Excused: Ige. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) One Day Notice 04-20-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Senate agrees with House amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Reading on 04-20-11. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Reconsideration of action taken on 04-14-11 in disagreeing to the House amendments. | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of change in conferees (Hse. Com. No. 656). | |
2011-04-19 | (S) Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 652). | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferee(s) replaced: Representative(s) B. Oshiro replaced Representative(s) Keith-Agaran as Co-Chairs. | |
2011-04-18 | (H) House conferees appointed: Mizuno, Keith-Agaran, Jordan Co-Chairs; Tsuji, Wooley, Pine. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 605). | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Senate disagrees with House amendments. | |
2011-04-14 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 483). | |
2011-04-12 | (H) Passed Third Reading as amended in HD 3 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Awana excused (1). Transmitted to Senate. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-12-11. | |
2011-04-08 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1534) as amended in HD 3, recommending passage on Third Reading. | |
2011-03-31 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 17 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Chong, Choy, Coffman, Cullen, Har, Hashem, Ichiyama, Jordan, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. | |
2011-03-28 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 03-31-11 4:00PM in House conference room 308. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting no and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1157) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Wooley excused (6). | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 971) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-14 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Jordan, Hanohano, C. Lee, Morikawa, Ching, Pine; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Wooley, Yamane. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HUS on Monday, 03-14-11 9:00AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HUS, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 211) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Shimabukuro). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 583) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-02-24 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Gabbard, Ihara, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-20 | (S) The committee(s) on JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-24-11 9:00AM in conference room 016. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from HMS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 216) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. | |
2011-02-08 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HMS were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Ihara, Green, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HMS has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-11 2:00PM in conference room 016. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HMS, JDL. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |