HI SB939 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-07 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Hawaii public housing authority to process terminations of tenancy or evictions from the federal low-income public housing program without providing a grievance hearing when permitted by the federal government.
Title
Hawaii Public Housing Authority; Termination and Eviction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-07 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDL. |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Reported from HMS/CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 128) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDL. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HMS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Chun Oakland, Taniguchi, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Kidani. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Galuteria, Nishihara, Solomon, Taniguchi, Wakai, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to HMS/CPN, JDL. |
2013-01-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on HMS/CPN added the measure to the public hearing scheduled on 01-31-13 10:15AM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HMS, JDL. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1116 (Same As) 2013-02-12 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cachola, Coffman, Takai excused (4).