HI SB948 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB948
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-01-29 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the department of transportation and each county's transportation department to create and maintain a priority list of sidewalk installation and improvement projects and to publish the priority list on their respective websites.
Title
Relating To Sidewalks.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB948 (Carry Over) 2021-01-29 - Referred to TRS/PSM, JDC.
HB1081 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - Act 125, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
HB1081 (Same As) 2021-06-29 - Act 125, on 06/28/2021 (Gov. Msg. No. 1227).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=948&year=2021 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2021/bills/SB948_.HTM |