HI SB959 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill to repeal inheritance and estate taxes that act as a form of double taxation on individual tax payers.
Title
Inheritance and estate taxation
Sponsors
Sen. Sam Slom [R] | Sen. William Espero [D] | Sen. Brickwood Galuteria [D] | Sen. Lorraine Inouye [D] |
Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Gil Riviere [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Carried over to 2016 Regular Session. | |
2015-01-28 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2015-01-26 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2015-01-23 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB476 (Same As) 2015-12-17 - Carried over to 2016 Regular Session.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=959&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/SB959_.HTM |