HI SB97 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB97
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies that the Board of Land and Natural Resources shall not unilaterally amend the terms and conditions of any lease of public lands being extended pursuant to Act 149, Session Laws of Hawaii 2018, except as otherwise provided therein; and if the Board of Land and Natural Resources wishes to amend the terms and conditions of any lease of public lands being extended to reflect the Board's most current lease form and leasing practices and policies, such lease form and leasing practices and policies must be included in the rules of the Board. Defines "lease of public lands". Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Public Lands.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-06 - Senate - Senate Water and Land: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-12-11 | Carried over to 2024 Regular Session. | |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 173) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDC/WAM. |
2023-02-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Chang, McKelvey, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Elefante ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-06-23 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2023-01-27 | Senate | Re-Referred to WTL, JDC/WAM. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Referred to WTL, JDC. |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Introduced and passed First Reading. |
2023-01-17 | Senate | Pending Introduction. |
Same As/Similar To
HB273 (Same As) 2023-12-11 - Carried over to 2024 Regular Session.
SB97 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
SB97 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDC/WAM.
Subjects
Board of Land and Natural Resources
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hilo Community Economic District
Lease Extension
Public Lands
Department of Land and Natural Resources
Hilo Community Economic District
Lease Extension
Public Lands