HI SB974 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB974
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning 7/1/2023: provides for new viable installment-based small dollar loan transactions; specifies various consumer protection requirements for small dollar loans; requires licensure for small dollar lenders, subject to the oversight of the division of financial institutions of the department of commerce and consumer affairs; specifies licensing requirements for small dollar lenders; and caps the maximum allowable loan size at $1,500. Amends requirements for check cashers, including requiring check cashers to be licensed with the department of commerce and consumer affairs, to offer voluntary payment plans to consumers, and make various notice and disclosure requirements. Requires the division of financial institutions to conduct an analysis of the regulation of payday lenders and deferred deposit agreements and report to the legislature. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD1)
Title
Relating To Consumer Protection.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Ways and Means: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1514) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. |
2021-03-24 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-03-22 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 03-24-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred to CPC, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2021-03-11 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 314) in amended form (SD 2). |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-09-21. |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Reported from WAM/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 913) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 10 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Inouye, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM/JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 10:35AM; CR 211 & Videoconference. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-12 | Senate | Reported from CPN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 169) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM/JDC. |
2021-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPN were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Chang, Misalucha, Nishihara, Riviere, San Buenaventura, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-21 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to CPN, WAM/JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB974 (Carry Over) 2021-03-25 - Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
Subjects
Check Cashers
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Licensure
Notices ($)
Payday Lending
Requirements
Small Dollar Lenders
Small Dollar Loans
Voluntary Payment Plans
Department of Commerce and Consumer Affairs
Licensure
Notices ($)
Payday Lending
Requirements
Small Dollar Lenders
Small Dollar Loans
Voluntary Payment Plans