HI SB980 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Enrolled on May 1 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-06 - Enrolled to Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Defines, for the purpose of compulsory education, a private school to be an education institution that teaches kindergarten through grade twelve and that is licensed or accredited by specified licensing or accrediting organizations. Effective 7/1/2020. (CD1)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating To Education.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-06SenateEnrolled to Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReceived notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 883).
2019-05-01HouseReceived notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 968).
2019-04-30HousePassed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0).
2019-04-30SenatePassed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-25HouseForty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 04-30-19.
2019-04-25HouseReported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 24) as amended in (CD 1).
2019-04-25Senate48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 04-30-19.
2019-04-25SenateReported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 24).
2019-04-22SenateThe Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, K. Rhoads, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-22HouseThe Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Takumi, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-04-18SenateConference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-19 1:00PM in conference room 329.
2019-04-18SenateReceived notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 813).
2019-04-17HouseHouse Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Takumi Co-Chairs; Okimoto.
2019-04-12HouseReceived notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 899).
2019-04-12SenateSenate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; K. Rhoads Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella.
2019-04-05HouseReceived notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 685).
2019-04-05SenateSenate disagrees with House amendments.
2019-04-04SenateDeferred One Day 04-05-19.
2019-04-03SenateDeferred One Day 04-04-19.
2019-04-03SenateReceived from House (Hse. Com. No. 532).
2019-04-02HousePassed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Saiki, Todd, Yamane excused (3). Transmitted to Senate.
2019-04-02HouseReported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1931), recommending passage on Third Reading.
2019-03-28HouseThe committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ichiyama, Aquino, Belatti, Cachola, Har, Kong, Mizuno, Onishi, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa.
2019-03-22HouseBill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-28-19 2:00PM in House conference room 329.
2019-03-21HousePassed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla Arakawa, Holt, Tokioka, Yamane excused (5).
2019-03-21HouseReported from LHE (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1540) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC.
2019-03-14HouseThe committees on LHE recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Hashem, Perruso, DeCoite, D. Kobayashi, Ohno, Quinlan, Tarnas, Tokioka, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Johanson.
2019-03-12HouseBill scheduled to be heard by LHE on Thursday, 03-14-19 2:30PM in House conference room 309.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to LHE, CPC, referral sheet 27
2019-03-05HousePass First Reading
2019-03-01HouseReceived from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 22).
2019-03-01SenateReport adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House.
2019-02-28SenateOne Day Notice 03-01-19.
2019-02-28SenateReported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 809) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading.
2019-02-21SenateThe committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 2 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 1 No(es): Senator(s) Gabbard; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kim, Fevella.
2019-02-15SenateThe committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-21-19 9:00AM in conference room 016.
2019-02-08SenateReport adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC.
2019-02-08SenateReported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 134) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC.
2019-02-04SenateThe committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none.
2019-02-01SenateThe committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 2:55PM in conference room 229.
2019-01-24SenateReferred to EDU, JDC.
2019-01-22SenatePassed First Reading.
2019-01-18SenateIntroduced.

Same As/Similar To

HB409 (Same As) 2019-02-12 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.

Subjects


Hawaii State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback