HI SB981 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-01 - Carried over to 2012 Regular Session.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain council, board, and commission members to take a training course offered by the Office of Hawaiian Affairs relating to native Hawaiian traditional and customary rights, natural resource protection and access rights, and the public trust. Effective upon approval. (SB981 HD1)
Title
Office of Hawaiian Affairs; Customary Rights; Training
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-01 | Carried over to 2012 Regular Session. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Har, Riviere, Wooley excused. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1156), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Herkes, Ito, Luke, McKelvey, B. Oshiro, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Souki. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-22-11 2:00PM in House conference room 325. | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting no (0) and Chang, Coffman, Herkes, Keith-Agaran, Nakashima, Wooley excused (6). | |
2011-03-18 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 996) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Yamane. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-16-11 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HAW, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 225) in amended form (SD 2). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 23; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Ryan, Solomon . Noes, 2 (Senator(s) Green, Slom). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 714) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). | |
2011-03-01 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Kouchi, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 03-01-11 9:20AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 211) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, Kahele, Kidani, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Hee, Slom. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-28 | (S) Re-Referred to HWN, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HWN. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |