HI SB983 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB983
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, LBR.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-17 - Re-Referred to CPH, LBR.
Pending: Senate Commerce, Consumer Protection, and Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires an opioid therapy informed consent process agreement to be executed between an injured employee and a physician who prescribes opioids within the State under certain conditions. Requires the harm reduction services branch of the department of health to develop and make available a template of an opioid therapy informed consent process agreement between injured employees and physicians for use in the State and advise the department of labor and industrial relations on the contents of the agreement. Limits prescriptions for compounded prescription drugs to a 30-day supply and reimbursements for compounded prescription drugs to an unspecified amount in a thirty-day period. Limits reimbursements for any schedule II drug under chapter 329, Uniform Controlled Substances Act, Hawaii Revised Statutes, dispensed by a physician to reimbursement for an initial, seven-day supply upon the first visit. Effective 7/1/2050. (SD1)
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation Prescription Drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-17 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, LBR. |
2017-11-30 | Carried over to 2018 Regular Session. | |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL. |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 391) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to JDL. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-17 9:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Re-Referred to CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to PSM/CPH, JDL. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1117 (Same As) 2017-11-30 - Carried over to 2018 Regular Session.
SB983 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.
SB983 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to JDL.