HI SB984 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-14 - Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds as a grant pursuant to chapter 42F, Hawaii Revised Statutes, to Pacific Renal Care Foundation.
Title
Pacific Renal Care Foundation; Department of Health; Appropriation ($)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-14 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Reported from HTH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 309) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-11 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Green, Baker, Chun Oakland, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Slom. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH deferred the measure until 02-11-13 2:00PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on HTH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-13 1:15PM in conference room 229. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to HTH, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1435 (Same As) 2013-01-28 - Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 7