HI SB984 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 153, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1254).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-11 - Act 153, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1254).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends the definition of "physician" in Workers' Compensation Law to include advanced practice registered nurses. (CD1)
Title
Relating To Workers' Compensation Physician.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-11 | Senate | Act 153, 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1254). |
2017-07-11 | House | Act 153, on 07/10/2017 (Gov. Msg. No. 1254). |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Enrolled to Governor. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Received notice of passage on Final Reading in House (Hse. Com. No. 642). |
2017-05-03 | House | Received notice of Final Reading (Sen. Com. No. 737). |
2017-05-02 | House | Passed Final Reading as amended in CD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Har voting no (1) and none excused (0). |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Passed Final Reading, as amended (CD 1). 25 Aye(s); Aye(s) with reservations: none . 0 No(es): none. 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-27 | House | Forty-eight (48) hours notice Tuesday, 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | House | Reported from Conference Committee (Conf Com. Rep. No. 17) as amended in (CD 1). |
2017-04-27 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice (as amended CD 1) 05-02-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Reported from Conference Committee as amended CD 1 (Conf. Com. Rep. No. 17). |
2017-04-20 | House | The Conference Committee recommends that the measure be Passed, with Amendments. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Takumi, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | The Conference committee recommends that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes of the Senate Conference Managers were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, Baker, K. Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-20-17 1:30PM in conference room 325. |
2017-04-18 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 681). |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Keith-Agaran Chair; Baker Co-Chair; K. Rhoads. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 587). |
2017-04-17 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Holt, Takumi Co-Chairs; Yamashita, Matsumoto. |
2017-04-06 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 514). |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-05-17. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 393). |
2017-04-03 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Har, McKelvey, Oshiro, Say excused (5). Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-03 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1557), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2017-03-30 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ito, Say, Takayama, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ichiyama, Aquino, Yamane, Fukumoto. |
2017-03-29 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-28 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Thursday, 03-30-17 2:00PM in House conference room 329. |
2017-03-24 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, C. Lee, Thielen excused (6). |
2017-03-24 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1334) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2017-03-23 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Holt, Keohokalole, Nakashima, Yamashita, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2017-03-20 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by LAB on Thursday, 03-23-17 10:00AM in House conference room 309. |
2017-03-17 | House | Re-referred to LAB, CPC, referral sheet 32 |
2017-03-07 | House | Referred to LAB/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 26 |
2017-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2017-03-03 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 66). |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none. Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Gabbard). Transmitted to House. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-03-17. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Reported from JDL/CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 613) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and placement on the calendar for Third Reading. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard. |
2017-02-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Ihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 02-27-17 9:00AM in conference room 016. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to JDL/CPH. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1118 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to LAB/HLT, CPC, referral sheet 5