HI SB985 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Har excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-22 - (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Har excused (2).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates funds for the operating budget of the Office of Hawaiian Affairs for fiscal years 2011-2012 and 2012-2013. Effective July 1, 2011. (SB985 HD1)
Title
OHA Budget
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-22 | (H) Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Har excused (2). | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1024) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to FIN. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Jordan, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Pine, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Yamane. | |
2011-03-11 | (H) Bill scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-16-11 8:30AM in House conference room 329. | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Referred to HAW, FIN, referral sheet 33 | |
2011-03-10 | (H) Pass First Reading | |
2011-03-08 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 226) in amended form (SD 1). | |
2011-03-08 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) 48 Hrs. Notice 03-08-11. | |
2011-03-04 | (S) Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 671) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). | |
2011-02-25 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 13 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Fukunaga, Kahele, Kim, Ryan, Tokuda, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) Slom ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. | |
2011-02-22 | (S) The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-25-11 9:00AM in conference room 211. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. | |
2011-02-15 | (S) Reported from HWN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 209) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. | |
2011-02-09 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HWN were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Galuteria, Ryan, Kahele, Kidani, Solomon; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) English, Hee, Slom. | |
2011-02-02 | (S) The committee(s) on HWN has scheduled a public hearing on 02-09-11 2:45PM in conference room 224. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Referred to HWN, WAM. | |
2011-01-24 | (S) Passed First Reading. | |
2011-01-21 | (S) Introduced. |