HI SB986 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB986
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to CPN/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-01-27 - Referred to CPN/JDC, WAM.
Pending: Senate Commerce and Consumer Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires corporations to include the income of all foreign subsidiaries to the State. Applies the State's apportionment formula to determine the share of reported profits subject to the appropriate tax. Effective 1/1/2023.
Title
Relating To Tax Haven Abuse.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-27 | Senate | Referred to CPN/JDC, WAM. |
2023-01-23 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB986 (Carry Over) 2023-01-27 - Referred to CPN/JDC, WAM.
HB149 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
HB149 (Same As) 2023-01-25 - Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 1
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=986&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/SB986_.HTM |