HI SB992 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB992
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-09 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires that the management contract for the Hawaii Convention Center be separate from the contract for marketing for all uses of the facility. (SB992 HD2)
Title
Relating To Tourism.
Sponsors
Sen. Glenn Wakai [D] | Sen. Breene Harimoto [D] | Sen. Rosalyn Baker [D] | Sen. Stanley Chang [D] |
Sen. Gil Keith-agaran [D] | Sen. Michelle Kidani [D] | Sen. Clarence Nishihara [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885). |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 681). |
2019-04-05 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Mizuno, Nishimoto excused (3). Transmitted to Senate. |
2019-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2115), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2019-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Eli, Gates, Hashimoto, Kitagawa, B. Kobayashi, Matayoshi, Nakamura, Todd, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Nishimoto. |
2019-04-01 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-03-19 2:00PM in House conference room 308. |
2019-03-22 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Quinlan, Yamane excused (2). |
2019-03-22 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1577) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-03-20 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) C. Lee, San Buenaventura, Creagan, Lowen, Morikawa, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McKelvey, Yamane. |
2019-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 03-20-19 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2019-03-19 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 03-20-19. |
2019-03-15 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-19-19 2:05PM in House conference room 325. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Takumi excused (1). |
2019-03-14 | House | Reported from TIA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1292) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2019-03-12 | House | The committees on TIA recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Onishi, Holt, Cabanilla Arakawa, Cachola, Creagan, DeCoite, Perruso, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2019-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 03-12-19 9:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred to TIA, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2019-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2019-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 323) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Harimoto). Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-19. |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1090) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-02-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Dela Cruz, Keith-Agaran, English, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Kanuha, Kidani, Moriwaki, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Taniguchi. |
2019-02-13 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-15-19 10:15AM in conference room 211. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to WAM. |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Reported from EET/GVO (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 193) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to WAM. |
2019-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in GVO were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) L. Thielen, Inouye, Baker, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on GVO deferred the measure until 02-05-19 3:20PM in conference room 225. |
2019-02-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, J.Keohokalole; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Fevella. |
2019-01-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET/GVO has scheduled a public hearing on 02-04-19 2:45PM in conference room 414. |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Referred to EET/GVO, WAM. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2019-01-18 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB992 (Carry Over) 2019-04-09 - Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 885).