HI SCR105 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR105
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers, Mutual Benefit Societies, And Health Maintenance Organizations To Provide Coverage For Medically Necessary Cognitive Rehabilitation Therapy For Survivors Of Traumatic Brain Injury.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Assess The Social And Financial Effects Of Requiring Health Insurers, Mutual Benefit Societies, And Health Maintenance Organizations To Provide Coverage For Medically Necessary Cognitive Rehabilitation Therapy For Survivors Of Traumatic Brain Injury.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-28 | House | Received notice of Senate agreement and Adoption (Sen. Com No. 734). |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-28-17. |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate agrees with House Amendments. Placed on the calendar for Final Adoption on 04-28-17. |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-27-17. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-26-17. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Deferred One Day 04-25-17. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 591). |
2017-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-21 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Souki, Takumi, Tokioka excused (8). |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1820), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan. |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-20-17 10:45AM in conference room 308. |
2017-04-17 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6). |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1787) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-04-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2017-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-13-17 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 445) in amended form (SD 1). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1430) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 11 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, K. Kahele, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Taniguchi, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 9:45AM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1259), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in CPH were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero, Kidani; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-17 9:30AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR105 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HCR165 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR165 (Same As) 2017-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Subjects
Auditor
Cognitive Rehabilitation Therapy
Impact Assessment Report
Mandated Coverage
Traumatic Brain Injury
Cognitive Rehabilitation Therapy
Impact Assessment Report
Mandated Coverage
Traumatic Brain Injury