HI SCR107 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR107
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designating October 13, 2017, As Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.
Title
Designating October 13, 2017, As Metastatic Breast Cancer Awareness Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Senate | Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 611). |
2017-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2017-04-21 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) DeCoite, Har, Ichiyama, Ing, Ito, Souki, Takumi, Tokioka excused (8). |
2017-04-21 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1821), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-20 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) DeCoite, Quinlan. |
2017-04-18 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-20-17 10:45AM in conference room 308. |
2017-04-17 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Kobayashi, C. Lee, McKelvey, Oshiro, Souki excused (6). |
2017-04-17 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1788), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-04-13 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Todd; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro, Tupola. |
2017-04-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-13-17 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to HLT, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 410). |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-17. |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported from CPH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1280) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in CPH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Baker, Nishihara, S. Chang, Espero; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Kidani, Ruderman. |
2017-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on CPH has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 10:00AM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to CPH. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR107 (Carry Over) 2017-05-30 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 05-30-17.
HCR163 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Referred to CPH.
HCR163 (Same As) 2017-04-07 - Referred to CPH.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=107&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR107_.HTM |