HI SCR117 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR117
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to PBS/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 6 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to PBS/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
Pending: House Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Continuation And Expansion Of Community-based Work Furlough Programs To Assist Female Inmates Transition Back Into Society.
Title
Encouraging The Continuation And Expansion Of Community-based Work Furlough Programs To Assist Female Inmates Transition Back Into Society.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to PBS/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41 |
2017-04-06 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 450). |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported from JDL/WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1424) with recommendation of adoption. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in WAM were as follows: 9 Aye(s): Senator(s) Tokuda, Dela Cruz, English, Galuteria, Harimoto, Inouye, Riviere, Shimabukuro, Wakai; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) K. Kahele, Taniguchi. |
2017-04-04 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDL were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Keith-Agaran, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2017-03-31 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL/WAM will hold a public decision making on 04-04-17 1:30PM in conference room 211. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported from PSM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1240), with recommendation of referral to JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in PSM were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Nishihara, Baker, Ihara, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Wakai. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-17 1:20PM in conference room 229. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Re-Referred to PSM, JDL/WAM. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred to PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR117 (Carry Over) 2017-04-07 - Referred to PBS/JUD, FIN, referral sheet 41
HCR158 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR158 (Same As) 2017-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=117&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SCR117_.HTM |