HI SCR126 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The Department Of Agriculture And Hawaii State Energy Office To Increase The State's Usage Of Biodiesel And To Fund Programs That Support The Development Of The Biodiesel Industry.
Title
Encouraging The Department Of Agriculture And Hawaii State Energy Office To Increase The State's Usage Of Biodiesel And To Fund Programs That Support The Development Of The Biodiesel Industry.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Energy, Economic Development, and Tourism: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, Unamended (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 415). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN/EET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3568) with recommendation of adoption. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in AEN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, Richards, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Awa. |
2024-04-02 | Senate | The committee(s) on EET recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EET were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) DeCoite, Wakai, Fukunaga, Kim, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/EET has scheduled a public hearing on 04-02-24 1:05PM; Conference Room 229 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to AEN/EET. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR108 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted.