HI SCR133 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR133
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kahaluu, North Kona, Island Of Hawaii.
Title
Authorizing The Issuance Of A Term Lease Covering A Portion Of State Submerged Lands At Kahaluu, North Kona, Island Of Hawaii.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | Senate | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-24 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 659). |
2018-04-23 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2018-04-23 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Evans, Hashem, Say excused (3). |
2018-04-23 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2075-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-19 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-04-17 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-19-18 11:00AM in conference room 309. |
2018-04-16 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Thielen voting no (1) and Representative(s) Kobayashi, Lowen, McKelvey, Mizuno, Nakamura, Quinlan, Tokioka excused (7). |
2018-04-16 | House | Reported from WAL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2019-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-13 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Todd, Cullen, Kong, Lowen; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Thielen; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee, McKelvey. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by WAL on Friday, 04-13-18 10:30AM in conference room 325. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to WAL, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 529) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Adopted. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Waived referral to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from WTL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3339), as amended (SD 1), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Riviere, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-18 2:51PM in conference room 224. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to WTL, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR133 (Carry Over) 2017-04-06 - Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 39
HCR189 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR189 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).