HI SCR133 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR133
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Saiki, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-12 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Saiki, Say, Thielen excused (4).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Harbors Division Of The Department Of Transportation To Inform The Maritime Community Of The Procedures To Be Taken In Preparation Of A Storm And Assist The Maritime Community With Submitting Their Application For A Maritime Heavy Weather And Hurricane Plan.
Title
Requesting The Harbors Division Of The Department Of Transportation To Inform The Maritime Community Of The Procedures To Be Taken In Preparation Of A Storm And Assist The Maritime Community With Submitting Their Application For A Maritime Heavy Weather And Hurricane Plan.
Sponsors
Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-12 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Saiki, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2019-04-12 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2218), recommending referral to FIN. |
2019-04-10 | House | The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Hashimoto, Brower, Cullen, Matayoshi, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem, McDermott. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 04-10-19 10:30AM in conference room 423. |
2019-04-05 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 50 |
2019-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 624) in amended form (SD 1). |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-19. |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TRS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1748) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2019-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TRS were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Inouye, Shimabukuro, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Harimoto, English. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TRS has scheduled a public hearing on 04-01-19 1:15PM in conference room 225. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Re-Referred to TRS. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to TRS, WAM. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR133 (Carry Over) 2019-04-12 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Holt, Saiki, Say, Thielen excused (4).
HCR164 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33
HCR164 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 33