HI SCR138 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to EEP/TRN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to EEP/TRN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation And Adaption Commission To Develop Vehicle Miles Traveled Reduction Strategies And Make Related Recommendations.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Climate Change Mitigation And Adaption Commission To Develop Vehicle Miles Traveled Reduction Strategies And Make Related Recommendations.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Agriculture and Environment: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to EEP/TRN, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 423) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from AEN/TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3490) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in AEN were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Gabbard, DeCoite, Rhoads; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Richards, Awa. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on AEN/TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:00PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to AEN/TCA. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR51 (Same As) 2024-04-02 - Referred to AEN/TCA.
SR119 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).
SR119 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).