HI SCR143 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR143
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-11 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Lower and Higher Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Board Of Education To Include Instruction In Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Into Health Education Curriculum For Students In Grades Nine Through Twelve In All Public Schools In The State.
Title
Urging The Board Of Education To Include Instruction In Cardiopulmonary Resuscitation Into Health Education Curriculum For Students In Grades Nine Through Twelve In All Public Schools In The State.
Sponsors
Sen. Dru Kanuha [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-11 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-04-10 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Thursday, 04-11-19 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-10 | House | The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-11-19 at 2:00PM. |
2019-04-08 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LHE on Wednesday, 04-10-19 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2019-04-03 | House | Referred to LHE, FIN, referral sheet 49 |
2019-04-01 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 545). |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-01-19. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1662) with recommendation of adoption. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Dela Cruz. |
2019-03-15 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 03-18-19 2:45PM in conference room 229. |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred to EDU. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR143 (Carry Over) 2019-04-11 - The committee(s) on LHE recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=143&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/SCR143_.HTM |