HI SCR147 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR147
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Hawaii Tourism Authority To Send A Letter To The United States Olympic Committee, International Olympic Committee, And Tokyo Organizing Committee Of The Olympic And Paralympic Games Stating That The State Of Hawaii Is The Ideal Location For Sports Training For Athletes For The Upcoming 2020 Tokyo Olympics And Paralympics.
Title
Requesting The Hawaii Tourism Authority To Send A Letter To The United States Olympic Committee, International Olympic Committee, And Tokyo Organizing Committee Of The Olympic And Paralympic Games Stating That The State Of Hawaii Is The Ideal Location For Sports Training For Athletes For The Upcoming 2020 Tokyo Olympics And Paralympics.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Report adopted, referred to WAM. |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Reported from ETT/JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3237), with recommendation of referral to WAM. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) L. Thielen. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in ETT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Wakai, Taniguchi, Galuteria; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Baker, L. Thielen. |
2018-03-20 | Senate | The committee(s) on ETT/JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-23-18 1:30PM in conference room 414. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to ETT/JDC, WAM. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR147 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - The committee on PSM deferred the measure.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=147&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/SCR147_.HTM |