HI SCR148 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-31 - The committee on WTL deferred the measure.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Agriculture And Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Develop A Plan To Purchase The Kohala Ditch System In The District Of North Kohala On The Island Of Hawaii.
Title
DOA; ADC; DLNR; Kohala Ditch
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee on WTL deferred the measure. |
2015-03-31 | Senate | The committee on AGL deferred the measure. |
2015-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on AGL/WTL has scheduled a public hearing on 03-31-15 2:50PM in conference room 414. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to AGL/WTL, WAM. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SCR&billnumber=148&year=2015 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2015/bills/SCR148_.HTM |