HI SCR148 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR148
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, C. Lee, McKelvey, Mizuno, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 5 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-13 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, C. Lee, McKelvey, Mizuno, Woodson excused (5).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Pass Legislation To Clarify The Status Of Migrants Under The Compacts Of Free Association For Purposes Of The Real Id Act Of 2005 To Promote Fairness And Equality Under The Law And Urging The United States Citizenship And Immigration Services To Delineate Compact Of Free Association Status As A Specific Category In The Systematic Alien Verification For Entitlements System.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Pass Legislation To Clarify The Status Of Migrants Under The Compacts Of Free Association For Purposes Of The Real Id Act Of 2005 To Promote Fairness And Equality Under The Law And Urging The United States Citizenship And Immigration Services To Delineate Compact Of Free Association Status As A Specific Category In The Systematic Alien Verification For Entitlements System.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-13 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Fukumoto, C. Lee, McKelvey, Mizuno, Woodson excused (5). |
2018-04-13 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1991-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-04-12 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Fukumoto, Cachola, Choy, Ito, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno, Tokioka, Woodson, Ward. |
2018-04-10 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Thursday, 04-12-18 11:30AM in conference room 429. |
2018-04-10 | House | Referred to VMI, FIN, referral sheet 53 |
2018-04-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 535) in amended form (SD 1). |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-05-18. |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3403) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2018-03-27 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDC were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, K. Rhoads, Gabbard, Kim, L. Thielen; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2018-03-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC has scheduled a public hearing on 03-27-18 9:30AM in conference room 016. |
2018-03-15 | Senate | Referred to JDC. |
2018-03-09 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR148 (Carry Over) 2017-03-15 - Referred to CPH, WAM.
HCR104 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR104 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).