HI SCR149 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 4 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Convene A Task Force To Research And Develop A Plan To Expand Access To Chess As A Competitive Sport.
Title
Urging The State Foundation On Culture And The Arts To Convene A Task Force To Research And Develop A Plan To Expand Access To Chess As A Competitive Sport.
Sponsors
Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Culture and the Arts: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2024-04-04 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 432) in amended form (SD 1). |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-04-24. |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Reported from TCA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3617) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2024-03-28 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in TCA were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Lee, Elefante, Kanuha; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Inouye, Awa. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on TCA has scheduled a public hearing on 03-28-24 3:02PM; Conference Room 224 & Videoconference. |
2024-03-14 | Senate | Referred to TCA. |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Offered. |
Same As/Similar To
SR127 (Same As) 2024-04-04 - Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1).