HI SCR150 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - (S) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on April 26 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-26 - (S) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Proclaiming September 26, 2010, As Mesothelioma Awareness Day.
Title
Mesothelioma Awareness Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-26 | (S) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-26 | (S) Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 623). | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Transmitted to Senate. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Representative(s) Bertram, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2010-04-23 | (H) Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-22 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamane, Nishimoto, Belatti, Mizuno, Shimabukuro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Bertram, Brower, Carroll, Finnegan. | |
2010-04-21 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Thursday, 04-22-10 11:00AM in conference room 229. | |
2010-04-12 | (H) Referred to HLT, referral sheet 67 | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 556). | |
2010-04-09 | (S) Report and Resolution Adopted. Transmitted to House. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) One Day Notice 04-09-10. | |
2010-04-08 | (S) Reported from HTH/EDT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 3080) with recommendation of adoption. | |
2010-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on EDT recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDT were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Fukunaga, Baker, Ige; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Hee, Slom. | |
2010-04-05 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in HTH were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Baker, Espero, Nishihara; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Green, Hemmings. | |
2010-04-01 | (S) The committee(s) on HTH/EDT has scheduled a public hearing on 04-05-10 2:45PM in conference room 016. | |
2010-03-10 | (S) Referred to HTH/EDT. | |
2010-03-05 | (S) Offered. |