HI SCR156 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Re-referred to HED, referral sheet 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-14 - Re-referred to HED, referral sheet 50
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii Office Of The President And The College Of Hawaiian Language To Establish A Working Group To Consider The Restructuring Of The College Of Hawaiian Language And Examine The Expansion Of Hawaiian Language Instruction Throughout The University Of Hawaii System.
Title
College of Hawaiian Language; University of Hawaii System
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-14 | House | Re-referred to HED, referral sheet 50 |
2015-04-10 | House | Referred to OMH, HED, referral sheet 49 |
2015-04-09 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 469) in amended form (SD 1). |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Report and Resolution Adopted, as amended (SD 1). Transmitted to House. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | One Day Notice 04-09-15. |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Reported from HWN/HEA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1354) with recommendation of adoption, as amended (SD 1). |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HWN were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Shimabukuro, Galuteria, Inouye, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kahele. |
2015-04-06 | Senate | The committee(s) on HEA recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in HEA were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Taniguchi, Inouye, Kidani, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Kahele, Wakai. |
2015-04-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on HWN/HEA has scheduled a public hearing on 04-06-15 1:15PM in conference room 224. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Referred to HWN/HEA. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | Offered. |